+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On July 26, 1985 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On July 22, 1985 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 240.
On July 17, 1985 in the House:
- Resolution Agreed to in House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Science and Technology Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On July 9, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Space Science Applications.
On June 27, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Science and Technology.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor