+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On March 5, 1997 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 416 - 0, 2 Present .
- Considered as unfinished business.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Gilman moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
On March 4, 1997 in the House:
- Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 24, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere.
On February 10, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on International Relations.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor