+ − Summary
+ − Actions (15)
On November 21, 1989 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 20, 1989 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Rules discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On October 25, 1989 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Rules.
On October 23, 1989 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Mr. Bates asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Committee on House Administration discharged.
On October 18, 1989 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On August 3, 1989 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
On July 21, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Procurement and Printing.
On July 17, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor