+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 18, 1991 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 15, 1991 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On November 12, 1991 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Sawyer moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
On June 17, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Postsecondary Education.
On June 3, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor