+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On July 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Star Print ordered on the concurrent resolution.
On June 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On June 5, 2007 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 152 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Lantos moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
On May 23, 2007 in the House:
- Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 22, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor