+ − Summary
+ − Actions (11)
On August 10, 1987 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On August 7, 1987 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On August 7, 1987 in the House:
- Resolution Agreed to in House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Foreign Affairs Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Agriculture Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On July 23, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 14, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade.
On June 30, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor