+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On July 30, 1987 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On July 28, 1987 in the House:
- Resolution Agreed to in House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 15, 1987 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 6, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere Affairs.
On June 23, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor