+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On June 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On June 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On June 5, 2012 in the House:
- Mr. Lungren, Daniel E. asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Committee on House Administration discharged.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor