+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On October 13, 1993 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 229.
On October 12, 1993 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Rostenkowski moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
On October 7, 1993 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 103-280, Part I.
On October 6, 1993 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 30, 1993 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
On September 8, 1993 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On August 27, 1993 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received from State.
On July 9, 1993 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State.
On July 1, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Policy, Trade and Environment.
On June 24, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
On June 22, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor