+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On May 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On May 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On May 7, 2012 in the House:
- Ms. Herrera Beutler moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 106 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor