+ − Actions (16)
On December 8, 1981 in the Senate:
- House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Voice Vote.
On November 5, 1981 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
On October 30, 1981 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 358.
- Committee on Rules. Reported to Senate by Senator Mathias favorably with an amendment. With written report No. 97-262.
On October 29, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Rules. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
On September 22, 1981 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, and referred to the Committee on Rules.
On September 17, 1981 in the House:
- Resolution Agreed to in House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House as Privileged Matter.
On July 27, 1981 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar No: 39.
- Reported to House by House Committee on House Administration. Report No: 97-203.
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 23, 1981 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 13, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Contracts and Printing.
On April 6, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on House Administration.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor