+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 1, 2011 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-308 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 208.
On October 5, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor