+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On October 28, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-535.
- Signed by President.
On October 21, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 20, 1988 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 12, 1988 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 7, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 7, 1988 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to the House amendment to the Senate amendment by Voice Vote.
- Message on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendment to Senate amendment.
On October 6, 1988 in the Senate:
- House Agreed to Senate Amendment With an Amendment Pursuant to H.R.578 .
On December 22, 1987 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.1380 Amendment SP 1380 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.1380 Proposed by Senator Wilson. To provide that the boundary of the Caples Creek further planning area in the Eldorado National Forest, California, is modified as generally depicted on a map entitled "Caples Creek Further Planning Area, Eldorado National Forest," dated September 1987.
On September 25, 1987 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston without amendment. With written report No. 100-180.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 343.
On September 16, 1987 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On July 30, 1987 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks. Hearings held.
On July 13, 1987 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Interior Department, OMB.
On March 11, 1987 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On March 10, 1987 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On March 5, 1987 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 16.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-20.
On March 4, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 24, 1987 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On February 4, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.1380
To provide that the boundary of the Caples Creek further planning area in the Eldorado National Forest, California, is modified as generally depicted on a map entitled "Caples Creek Further Planning Area, Eldorado National Forest," dated September 1987.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor