+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 115-121. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Indian Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S153)
On September 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4266)
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4251-4257)
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4251-4259)
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 984.
- Mr. Wittman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House