+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 13, 1999 in the Senate:
- Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate amendment.
On April 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- House agreed to Senate amendments with an amendment pursuant to H. Res. 135 .
On March 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Amendment SP 249 proposed by Senator Enzi for Senator Thompson.
- Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.249 Proposed by Senator Enzi for Senator Thompson.
- Amendment SP 249 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.249 Amendment SP 249 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Referred to the Committee on Commerce by unanimous consent.
- Senate Committee on Commerce discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate without amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
On February 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Mr. Shuster moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 407 - 1 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On February 2, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 3.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 106-2 .
On January 7, 1999 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
On January 6, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor