+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On September 11, 2007 in the House:
- For Further Action See Title III of H.R. 2954 .
On May 9, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law.
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Border, Maritime, and Global Counterterrorism.
On January 11, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
On January 5, 2007 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On January 4, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to House Education and Labor
- Referred to House Homeland Security
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Homeland Security, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor