+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On December 28, 1995 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 104-77.
- Signed by President.
On December 21, 1995 in the House:
- Presented to President.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 20, 1995 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On December 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On December 19, 1995 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 289.
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Chafee without amendment. Without written report.
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On December 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On December 5, 1995 in the House:
- Mr. Gilchrest moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 415 - 0 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On November 28, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 138.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 104-366 .
On November 16, 1995 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 20, 1995 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 15, 1995 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 2, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Economic Development.
On February 15, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor