+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On March 8, 1993 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Commerce, State, DOT, EPA, NSF.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Natural Resources.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Oceanography, Gulf of Mexico, and the Outer Continental Shelf.
On March 2, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee On Insular and International Affairs.
On March 1, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials.
On February 23, 1993 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Science.
On February 18, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space and Technology.
- Referred to the House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor