+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 117-93.
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 262.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. Without written report.
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On October 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On October 20, 2021 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5697-5698)
- Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On October 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On October 20, 2021 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 960.
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5697)
On October 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5697)
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor