+ − Summary
+ − Actions (16)
On November 28, 1975 in the Senate:
- Public law 94-139.
- Signed by President.
On November 21, 1975 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On November 21, 1975 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On November 20, 1975 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On November 20, 1975 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On November 19, 1975 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Public Works, S. Rept. 94-461.
On October 28, 1975 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Public Works.
On October 23, 1975 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by special rule in House.
On September 24, 1975 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Public Works and Transportation, H. Rept. 94-510.
On September 9, 1975 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor