+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On February 27, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 19, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 9, 1985 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On October 30, 1985 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On October 28, 1985 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 6, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Crime.
On February 6, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor