+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On December 12, 1975 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Finance, S. Rept. 94-547.
On November 5, 1975 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Finance.
On November 3, 1975 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by consent calendar in House.
On October 29, 1975 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs with admendment, H. Rept. 94-593.
On October 6, 1975 in the House:
- Rereferred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Committee on Ways and Means discharged in House.
On September 8, 1975 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Ron de Lugo
Type:
Primary Sponsor