+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 24.
- Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-46.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 2, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor