+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 7, 2018 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 115-194.
- Signed by President.
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On June 22, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H5572)
- Mr. Collins (NY) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H5572-5573)
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.2242 Amendment SA 2242 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.2242 Amendment SA 2242 proposed by Senator Portman for Senator Alexander. (consideration: CR S2631-2632; text: CR S2631-2632) To require the Secretary of Health and Human Services to develop a voluntary registry to collect data on cancer incidence among firefighters.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2631-2632)
- Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On September 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
On September 12, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7248-7249)
- Mr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 931.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7248-7251)
On September 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 215.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-301.
On July 27, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 2242
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
S.Amdt.2242
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
+ − Sponsors (188)
Type:
Primary Sponsor