+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3214-3215)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 930.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3214-3215)
- Mr. Young (AK) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On September 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 159.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-219.
On July 31, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged.
On July 23, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor