+ − Summary
+ − Actions (8)
On September 17, 2007 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On July 12, 2007 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On June 28, 2007 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On June 11, 2007 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Committee Hearings Held.
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to House Armed Services
- Referred to House Foreign Affairs
- Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor