+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On October 19, 1979 in the House:
- Private Law 96-6.
- Signed by President.
On October 12, 1979 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On October 11, 1979 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 11, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
On October 3, 1979 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 96-345.
On August 7, 1979 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
On August 2, 1979 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
On July 19, 1979 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary, H. Rept. 96-354.
On January 15, 1979 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor