+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 16, 1973 in the House:
- Public law 93-155.
- Signed by President.
On November 7, 1973 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On November 5, 1973 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On November 5, 1973 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report, roll call #476 .
On October 31, 1973 in the House:
- House agreed to conference report.
On October 16, 1973 in the Senate:
- Conference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 93-467.
On October 13, 1973 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-588.
On October 2, 1973 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On October 1, 1973 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
- Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #448 .
On September 6, 1973 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, S. Rept. 93-385.
On August 1, 1973 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Armed Services.
On July 31, 1973 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #411 .
On July 18, 1973 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Armed Services, H. Rept. 93-383.
On July 16, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor