+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On October 1, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to concur in the Senate amendments with an amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 214 - 207 (Roll no. 214). (text: CR H5202-5417)
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with 2 hours of debate on motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments with an amendment.
- Mrs. Lowey moved that the House concur in the Senate amendments with an amendment. (consideration: CR H5202-5435)
- Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1161, Mrs. Lowey called up H.R. 925, with the Senate Amendments thereto and moved that the House agree in the Senate amendment to the title of H.R. 925 and that the House agree in the Senate amendment to the text of H.R. 925 with an amendment consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 116-66.
On September 30, 2020 in the House:
- Rule H. Res. 1161 passed House.
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1161 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 925 with 2 hours of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions. Measure will be considered read. A specified amendment is in order. Providing for the consideration of the Senate amendments to H.R. 925.
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On January 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- S.Amdt.1276 Amendment SA 1276 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Barrasso. (consideration: CR S148; text: CR S129-139) In the nature of a substitute.
- S.Amdt.1276 Amendment SA 1276 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote. (text: CR S148)
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S148)
- S.Amdt.1277 Amendment SA 1277 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.1277 Amendment SA 1277 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Barrasso. (consideration: CR S148; text: CR S148) To amend the title.
On November 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On November 20, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9083)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 925.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9083-9084)
- Mr. Sablan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On November 13, 2019 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-284.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 229.
On September 25, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 9.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
On September 24, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (4)
SA 1276
In the nature of a substitute.
S.Amdt.1276
In the nature of a substitute.
SA 1277
To amend the title.
S.Amdt.1277
To amend the title.
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor