+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On May 3, 1993 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On March 2, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
On February 19, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Specialty Crops and Natural Resources.
On February 18, 1993 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On February 17, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor