+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry.
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to House Financial Services
- Referred to House Natural Resources
- Referred to House Agriculture
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor