+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (30)
On December 7, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 112-205.
On November 30, 2012 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 27, 2012 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 915 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 397 - 4 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On November 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Mr. McCaul moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment.
On September 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
On August 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/02/2012 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 112-206 .
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 497.
On June 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On June 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Mr. King moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 915 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 391 - 2 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On November 4, 2011 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 112-268 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 179.
On September 21, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On June 2, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.