+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On May 12, 1995 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 11, 1995 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 10, 1995 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 3, 1995 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On February 21, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Telecommunications and Finance.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
On February 13, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor