+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- House amendment not agreed to: On agreeing to the Cammack amendment (A003) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 204 - 216 (Roll no. 169).
- House amendment not agreed to: On agreeing to the Guest amendment (A004) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 200 - 221 (Roll no. 170).
- Roll call votes on amendments in House
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- House amendment agreed to: On agreeing to the Rules amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
- Amendment in the nature of a substitute reported by the House Committee on Rules. (consideration: CR H4878-4896; text: CR H4878-4880)
- On agreeing to the Rules amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
- House amendment agreed to: On agreeing to the Thompson (MS) amendments (A002) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 215 - 198 (Roll no. 168).
- Amendment agreed to by House: On agreeing to the Thompson (MS) amendments (A002) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 215 - 198 (Roll no. 168).
- House amendment offered/reported by: Amendments en bloc (A002) offered by Mr. Thompson (MS).
- Amendments en bloc (A002) offered by Mr. Thompson (MS). (consideration: CR H4887-4889, H4891-4892; text: CR H4887-4888)
- The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A002) pursuant to the rule.
- On agreeing to the Thompson (MS) amendments (A002) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 215 - 198 (Roll no. 168).
- Amendment failed by House: On agreeing to the Cammack amendment (A003) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 204 - 216 (Roll no. 169).
- House amendment offered/reported by: Amendment (A003) offered by Mrs. Cammack.
- Amendment (A003) offered by Mrs. Cammack. (consideration: CR H4889-4890, H4892-4893; text: CR H4889)
- The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A003) pursuant to the rule.
- On agreeing to the Cammack amendment (A003) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 204 - 216 (Roll no. 169).
- Amendment failed by House: On agreeing to the Guest amendment (A004) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 200 - 221 (Roll no. 170).
- House amendment offered
- House amendment offered/reported by: Amendment (A004) offered by Mr. Guest.(consideration: CR H4890-4891, H4893; text: CR H4890)
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1097, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Guest amendment No. 5.
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 220 - 201 (Roll no. 172).
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment (A004) offered by Mr. Guest. (consideration: CR H4890-4891, H4893; text: CR H4890)
- The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A004) pursuant to the rule.
- On agreeing to the Guest amendment (A004) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 200 - 221 (Roll no. 170).
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1097. (consideration: CR H4878-4896)
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 903, H.R. 2499, H.R. 5129 and H.R. 7691. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 903, H.R. 2499, and H.R. 5129 under a structured rule. H.R. 7691 is considered under a closed rule. Bills considered under the rule are debatable for one hour. The rule provides that H. Res. 1096 is adopted and amends H. Res. 188 by striking May 13, 2022 and inserting June 10, 2022.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 903.
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1097, the House proceeded with 20 minutes of debate on the Thompson (MS) amendment en bloc.
- POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Thompson (MS) amendment en bloc, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Cloud demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1097, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Cammack amendment No. 3.
- POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Cammack amendment No. 3, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mrs. Cammack demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
- POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Guest amendment No. 5, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Guest demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- Mr. Gooden (TX) moved to recommit to the Committee on Homeland Security. (text: CR H4893-4894)
- The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX.
- On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 205 - 216 (Roll no. 171).
- Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 220 - 201 (Roll no. 172).
On May 10, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1097 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 903, H.R. 2499, H.R. 5129 and H.R. 7691. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 903, H.R. 2499, and H.R. 5129 under a structured rule. H.R. 7691 is considered under a closed rule. Bills considered under the rule are debatable for one hour. The rule provides that H. Res. 1096 is adopted and amends H. Res. 188 by striking May 13, 2022 and inserting June 10, 2022.
On May 6, 2022 in the House:
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 117-310, Part I.
- Committee on Oversight and Reform discharged.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 230.
On July 28, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 11.
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearings Held.
On February 6, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security.
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Amendments (5)
H.Amdt.197
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.198
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.199
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
All Actions
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.200
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
+ − Sponsors (228)
Type:
Primary Sponsor