+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 8, 2012 in the House:
- Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 368.
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than June 8, 2012.
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than March 9, 2012.
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than March 1, 2012.
On January 6, 2012 in the House:
- House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Jan. 20, 2012.
On November 11, 2011 in the House:
- House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Jan. 6, 2012.
On September 26, 2011 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 112-224 , Part I.
- House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 11, 2011.
On June 22, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 6 - 4 .
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy.
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies.
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Homeland Security
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor