+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
On July 29, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 177.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 114-235.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 8.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearings Held.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet Discharged.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor