+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On December 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On December 2, 2022 in the House:
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1499. (consideration: CR H8713-8721)
On December 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On December 2, 2022 in the House:
- House amendment offered
- Amendment in the nature of a substitute reported by the House Committee on Rules.
- On agreeing to the Rules amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
- House amendment agreed to: On agreeing to the Rules amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3372, H.R. 6878, H.R. 8876 and H.J. Res. 100. The resolution provides for adoption of H. Res. 1495 and H. Con. Res. 118.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 8876.
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 390 - 26 (Roll no. 500).
On December 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 390 - 26 (Roll no. 500). (text: CR H8713-8715)
On November 30, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 426.
- Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1499 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3372, H.R. 6878, H.R. 8876 and H.J. Res. 100. The resolution provides for adoption of H. Res. 1495 and H. Con. Res. 118.
On November 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 30, 2022.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 117-559, Part I.
On September 21, 2022 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 41 - 0.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 20, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On September 19, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (114)
Type:
Primary Sponsor