+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 8, 2020 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 116-153. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On July 28, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On July 20, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H3110)
- Mr. Cicilline asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table the bill, H.R. 886, and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H3110)
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S262)
- S.Amdt.1283 Amendment SA 1283 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.1283 Amendment SA 1283 proposed by Senator Moran for Senator McSally. (consideration: CR S262; text: CR S262) In the nature of a substitute.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S262)
- Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On October 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
On October 28, 2019 in the House:
- Ms. Bass moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-259.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 207.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8489-8491)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 886.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8489)
On October 16, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 15, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged.
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 1283
In the nature of a substitute.
S.Amdt.1283
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsors (135)
Type:
Primary Sponsor