+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On July 31, 1996 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On July 30, 1996 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. McHugh moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On June 20, 1996 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 13, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Postal Service.
On February 9, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform and Oversight.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor