+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On July 17, 1989 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 104.
- Reported by the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. H. Rept. 101-148.
On May 8, 1989 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received from USDA.
On May 3, 1989 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands Discha rged.
On April 6, 1989 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 31, 1989 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior, USDA, and Treasury.
On March 17, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On February 6, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor