+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 78.
- Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
- Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Reported by Senator Stabenow without amendment. Without written report.
On April 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 292 - 130 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 872 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Gibbs moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 112-43 , Part I.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 21.
- Reported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 112-43 , Part II.
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged.
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 46 - 8.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to House Agriculture
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsors (137)
Type:
Primary Sponsor