+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (30)
On August 16, 1994 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 103-297.
- Signed by President.
On August 4, 1994 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On August 2, 1994 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On August 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Senate agreed to House amendment to Senate amendment by Voice Vote.
On July 26, 1994 in the Senate:
- Message on House action received in Senate and at the desk: House amendment to Senate amendment.
On July 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- House agreed to Senate amendment with amendment pursuant to H. Res. 488 .
On July 1, 1993 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On June 30, 1993 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate in lieu of S. 568 with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- Senate struck all after the Enacting Clause and substituted the language of S. 568 amended.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Senate Committee on Commerce discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On March 3, 1993 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On March 2, 1993 in the House:
- Mr. Swift moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays : 411 - 3 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On February 24, 1993 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 9.
- Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 103-20.
On February 23, 1993 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 17, 1993 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 4, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials.
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor