+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On August 26, 1976 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Finance, S. Rept. 94-1173.
On June 10, 1976 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Finance.
On June 8, 1976 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
On April 29, 1976 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Ways and Means with amendment, H. Rept. 94-1062.
On July 15, 1975 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor