+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On March 24, 1995 in the House:
- See H.R.4 .
On March 2, 1995 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On February 24, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Postsecondary Education, Training and Life-Long Learning.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Nutrition and Foreign Agriculture.
On February 21, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
On February 15, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
On February 8, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Commerce
- Referred to House Economic and Educational Opportunities
- Referred to House Agriculture
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Commerce, and Economic and Educational Opportunities, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor