+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On November 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 105-138 . Additional views filed.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 257.
On October 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported in lieu of S. 1028 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On July 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Forests and Public Lands. Hearings held.
On July 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forests and Public Lands.
On July 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On July 9, 1997 in the House:
- Considered as unfinished business.
- Rule H. Res. 180 passed House.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 180 .
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 858 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be read by section. In lieu of the amendment recommended by the Committee on Resources now printed in the bill, it shall be in order to consider as an original bill for the purpose of amendment the amendment in the nature of a substitute printed in the Congressional Record of July 9, 1997, and numbered 1. Points of order against the amendment for failure to comply with clause 7 of rule XVI or clause 5 of rule XXI shall be waived. No amendment to that amendment shall be in order except an amendment printed in the Congressional Record, if offered by Mr. Miller or his designee. The amendment shall be debatable for one hour and shall not be subject to further amendment.
- House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 180 and Rule XXIII.
- The Speaker designated the Honorable Edward A. Pease to act as Chairman of the Committee.
- GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate.
- On motion that the Committee rise Agreed to by voice vote.
- Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union rises leaving H.R. 858 as unfinished business.
- Mr. Young asked unanimous consent that the order of business pursuant to H. Res. 180 be modified so that it shall be in order for Mr. Young to offer an amendment in lieu of the amendment by Mr. Miller identified in the Congressional Record of July 8, 1997, and that the amendment be considered under the same terms as would otherwise apply to the Miller amendment. Agreed to without objection.
- Mr. Young moved that the Committee rise.
- The House resolved into Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union for further consideration.
- H.AMDT.210 Amendment in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Young . Amendment in the nature of a substitute provides for the establishment of a pilot project by the Forest Service to implement a science-based fire protection and forest health plan in three National forests in northern California.
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 180 , the Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of debate on the Young amendment.
- H.AMDT.210 Young amendment modified by unanimous consent.
- H.AMDT.210 On agreeing to the Young amendment as modified Agreed to by voice vote.
- The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 858 .
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 429 - 1 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 858 .
On July 8, 1997 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 180 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 858 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be read by section. In lieu of the amendment recommended by the Committee on Resources now printed in the bill, it shall be in order to consider as an original bill for the purpose of amendment the amendment in the nature of a substitute printed in the Congressional Record of July 9, 1997, and numbered 1. Points of order against the amendment for failure to comply with clause 7 of rule XVI or clause 5 of rule XXI shall be waived. No amendment to that amendment shall be in order except an amendment printed in the Congressional Record, if offered by Mr. Miller or his designee. The amendment shall be debatable for one hour and shall not be subject to further amendment.
On June 18, 1997 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 105-136 , Part I.
- Committee on Agriculture discharged.
- House Committee on Agriculture Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than June 18, 1997.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 77.
On May 21, 1997 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 24, 1997 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 4 - 2.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 5, 1997 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 4, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry, Resource Conservation and Research.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health.
On February 27, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to House Agriculture
- Referred to House Resources
- Referred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.210
Amendment in the nature of a substitute provides for the establishment of a pilot project by the Forest Service to implement a science-based fire protection and forest health plan in three National forests in northern California.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor