+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On November 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
On November 15, 2005 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 353 - 62 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 856 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Osborne moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On July 25, 2005 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On March 24, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Select Education.
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
On February 15, 2005 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor