+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 2, 1974 in the House:
- Public law 93-242.
- Signed by President.
On December 22, 1973 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On December 20, 1973 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On December 20, 1973 in the Senate:
- House agreed to Senate amendments.
On December 18, 1973 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
On December 14, 1973 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce with amendment, S. Rept. 93-633.
On December 5, 1973 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Commerce.
On December 4, 1973 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
On December 1, 1973 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries with amendment, H. Rept. 93-687.
On June 7, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor