+ − Summary
+ − Actions (30)
On August 23, 1986 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 99-387.
- Signed by President.
On August 14, 1986 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On August 13, 1986 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On August 11, 1986 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On August 11, 1986 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On August 1, 1986 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 761.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator McClure without amendment. With written report No. 99-359.
On July 24, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources received executive comment from Interior Department. Favorable.
On July 16, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On March 4, 1986 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Public Lands and Reserved Water. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 99-600, PT. 2.
On February 18, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources received executive comment from Department of Agriculture. Unfavorable.
On December 26, 1985 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Interior Department, Agriculture Department, OMB.
On December 11, 1985 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands and Reserved Water.
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On December 9, 1985 in the House:
- Passed House by Unanimous Consent.
- Called up by House on Call of Consent Calendar.
On November 20, 1985 in the House:
- Placed on Consent Calendar No: 16.
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 228.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 99-384.
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 12, 1985 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 24, 1985 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From USDA.
On July 16, 1985 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 25, 1985 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior.
On February 19, 1985 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On February 12, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands.
On January 30, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor