+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On October 20, 1988 in the House:
- See H.R.5550 .
On October 22, 1987 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On October 20, 1987 in the House:
- Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 300 - 111 .
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On October 14, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 13, 1987 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 22, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 12, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From State.
On February 2, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State, Defense.
On January 26, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Asian and Pacific Affairs.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Arms Control, International Security and Science.
On January 6, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor