+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 29, 1982 in the House:
- Other Measure S.625 Passed House in Lieu.
- Laid on Table in House by Voice Vote.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On September 24, 1982 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 542.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 97-871.
On September 15, 1982 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On August 19, 1982 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 27, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On October 30, 1981 in the House:
- Favorable Executive Comment Received From Interior.
On March 30, 1981 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior.
On February 6, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands and National Parks.
On January 13, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor